Senate | 05/12/2011 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2266 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2266 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2236 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3968 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3549 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Record vote | RV#956 | Journal Page: 3548 |
House | 05/11/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3548 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3548 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3349 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3348 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Postponed | 5/9/11 6:45 PM | Journal Page: 3257 |
House | 05/09/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3257 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2324 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/01/2011 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 565 | |
House | 03/01/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 565 | |
House | 02/15/2011 | Filed |