E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6918
|
E
|
05/20/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4766
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2609
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4181
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4338
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2384
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4023
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1117
|
Journal Page: 4023
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4023
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3523
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2162
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2162
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2162
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2162
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2162
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2162
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2161
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2064
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1339
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1339
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1236
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2092
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1923
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#430
|
Journal Page: 1922
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1922
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1922
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1902
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1902
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1599
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 567
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 567
|
House
|
02/15/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|