Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1381 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Madden (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 1381
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2011;
 April 29, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 12, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 12, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the service of civil process on an inmate of the Texas
 Department of Criminal Justice.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 17, Civil Practice and
 Remedies Code, is amended by adding Section 17.029 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 17.029.  SERVICE ON INMATE OF TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
 CRIMINAL JUSTICE. (a)  In this section, "inmate" means a person
 confined in a facility operated by or under contract with the Texas
 Department of Criminal Justice.
 (b)  In a civil action against an inmate, citation or other
 civil process may be served on the inmate by serving a person
 designated under Subsection (c) as an agent for service of civil
 process.
 (c)  The warden of each facility operated by or under
 contract with the Texas Department of Criminal Justice shall
 designate an employee at the facility to serve as an agent for
 service of civil process on inmates confined in the facility.
 (d)  An employee designated under Subsection (c) as an agent
 for service of civil process shall promptly deliver any civil
 process served on the employee to the appropriate inmate.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than December 1, 2011, the warden of
 each facility operated by or under contract with the Texas
 Department of Criminal Justice shall designate an employee at the
 facility to serve as an agent for service of civil process as
 required by Section 17.029, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, as
 added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *