House | 05/06/2011 | Corrected committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2011 | Corrected comm. report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2011 | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator | Journal Page: 3202 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2171 | |
House | 04/13/2011 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2011 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/01/2011 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 568 | |
House | 03/01/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 568 | |
House | 02/16/2011 | Filed |