Senate | 05/13/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2309 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/02/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1631 | |
Senate | 05/02/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1631 | |
Senate | 04/27/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1364 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2391 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2192 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Record vote | RV#511 | Journal Page: 2192 |
House | 04/26/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2192 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2192 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2177 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2181 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2181 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2092 | |
House | 04/18/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/01/2011 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | Journal Page: 569 | |
House | 03/01/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 569 | |
House | 02/16/2011 | Filed |