Senate | 05/10/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2188 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2188 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2071 | |
House | 05/07/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3300 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3120 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Record vote | RV#808 | Journal Page: 3119 |
House | 05/06/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3119 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3119 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3075 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3075 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1866 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/01/2011 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 570 | |
House | 03/01/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 570 | |
House | 02/16/2011 | Filed |