1 | 1 | | 82R5466 TJS-F |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Strama H.B. No. 1434 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to contributions to the retirement systems for certain |
---|
8 | 8 | | police officers in certain municipalities. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Section 8.01(a)(2), Chapter 452 (S.B. 738), Acts |
---|
11 | 11 | | of the 72nd Legislature, Regular Session, 1991 (Article 6243n-1, |
---|
12 | 12 | | Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), is amended to read as follows: |
---|
13 | 13 | | (2) The city shall contribute amounts equal to 18 |
---|
14 | 14 | | percent of the basic hourly earnings of each member employed by the |
---|
15 | 15 | | city for all periods on or before September 30, 2010, subject to |
---|
16 | 16 | | additional amounts as provided by Subdivision (3) of this |
---|
17 | 17 | | subsection. The city shall contribute amounts equal to 19 percent |
---|
18 | 18 | | of the basic hourly earnings of each member employed by the city for |
---|
19 | 19 | | all periods after September 30, 2010, and before October 1, 2011, |
---|
20 | 20 | | subject to additional amounts as provided by Subdivision (3) of |
---|
21 | 21 | | this subsection. The city shall contribute amounts equal to 20 |
---|
22 | 22 | | percent of the basic hourly earnings of each member employed by the |
---|
23 | 23 | | city for all periods after September 30, 2011, and before October 1, |
---|
24 | 24 | | 2012, subject to additional amounts as provided by Subdivision (3) |
---|
25 | 25 | | of this subsection. The city shall contribute amounts equal to 21 |
---|
26 | 26 | | percent of the basic hourly earnings of each member employed by the |
---|
27 | 27 | | city for all periods after September 30, 2012, subject to |
---|
28 | 28 | | additional amounts as provided by Subdivision (3) of this |
---|
29 | 29 | | subsection. The city council may also authorize the city to make |
---|
30 | 30 | | additional contributions to the police retirement system in |
---|
31 | 31 | | whatever amount the city council may determine. Contributions by |
---|
32 | 32 | | the city shall be made each pay period. |
---|
33 | 33 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. |
---|