E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6918
|
E
|
05/20/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4766
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2609
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4181
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4338
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4120
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2380
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2380
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2380
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2380
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2380
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2380
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2380
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2224
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1631
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1631
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1364
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#523
|
Journal Page: 2206
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2206
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2206
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2161
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2161
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1768
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 572
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 572
|
House
|
02/17/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|