E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6918
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5140
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
HCR 173
|
Journal Page: 5080
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
HCR 173
|
Journal Page: 6077
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3716
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5662
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5663
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5663
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1491
|
Journal Page: 5662
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5662
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5045
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3125
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3125
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3125
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3125
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3125
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3125
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3125
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA4 Hegar
|
Journal Page: 3125
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 3124
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment to amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 3124
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA2 Fraser
|
Journal Page: 3124
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3122
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3122
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2971
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2611
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1705
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1705
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1385
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2272
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#545
|
Journal Page: 2272
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2272
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2272
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2215
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2214
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#531
|
Journal Page: 2213
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2213
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2213
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2106
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1909
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1789
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 1789
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 32
|
Journal Page: 1789
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1789
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1781
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1662
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 588
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 588
|
House
|
02/17/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|