House | 05/06/2011 | Postponed | 6/1/11 12:00 PM | Journal Page: 3138 |
House | 05/06/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3138 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Postponed | 5/6/11 12:00 PM | Journal Page: 2891 |
House | 05/04/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2891 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2877 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2390 | |
House | 04/18/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2011 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 590 | |
House | 03/02/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 590 | |
House | 02/17/2011 | Filed |