E | 06/17/2011 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6917 | |
E | 05/27/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6459 | |
Senate | 05/26/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4010 | |
House | 05/26/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5956 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5964 | |
House | 05/24/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5390 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3350 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3350 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3350 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3350 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3350 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3350 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 3350 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2975 | |
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1082 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1082 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 840 | |
House | 03/30/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1228 | |
House | 03/30/2011 | Record vote | RV#163 | Journal Page: 1130 |
House | 03/30/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1130 | |
House | 03/30/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1130 | |
House | 03/30/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1125 | |
House | 03/30/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1125 | |
House | 03/30/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1072 | |
House | 03/14/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/14/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/14/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/11/2011 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 324 | |
House | 02/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 324 | |
House | 11/08/2010 | Filed |