Senate | 05/09/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2143 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2143 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2052 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3202 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2993 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Record vote | RV#773 | Journal Page: 2993 |
House | 05/05/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2993 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2993 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2907 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Amended | 1-Berman | Journal Page: 2906 |
House | 05/04/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2906 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2551 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2011 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 592 | |
House | 03/02/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 592 | |
House | 02/18/2011 | Filed |