E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6918
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5140
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5070
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6519
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1690
|
Journal Page: 6518
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6517
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR2550
|
Journal Page: 6516
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
HCR 176
|
Journal Page: 5055
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
HCR 176
|
Journal Page: 6453
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6458
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1231
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4503
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6283
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6283
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4330
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4330
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3996
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3996
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3996
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5857
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5857
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5857
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5397
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3457
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3457
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3457
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3457
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3457
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
FA1 Lucio
|
Journal Page: 3457
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3457
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3457
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA2 Hegar
|
Journal Page: 3457
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Lucio
|
Journal Page: 3455
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3455
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3455
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2976
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2708
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 2143
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2143
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2052
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3202
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2945
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#722
|
Journal Page: 2945
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2945
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2945
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2932
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2932
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2324
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 593
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 593
|
House
|
02/18/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|