Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1517 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 1517


 AN ACT
 relating to the disposition of fines for traffic violations
 collected by certain counties and municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 542.402, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsections (a), (c), and (e) and adding Subsections
 (b-1), (b-2), (d-1), (f), and (g) to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b-1), a [A]
 municipality or county shall use a fine collected for a violation of
 a highway law in this title to:
 (1)  construct and maintain roads, bridges, and
 culverts in the municipality or county;
 (2)  enforce laws regulating the use of highways by
 motor vehicles; and
 (3)  defray the expense of county traffic officers.
 (b-1)  Subject to Subsection (b-2), a county may use a fine
 collected for a violation of a highway law as the county determines
 appropriate if:
 (1)  the county has a population of less than 5,000; and
 (2)  the commissioners court of the county by
 resolution elects to spend the revenue in a manner other than as
 provided by Subsection (a).
 (b-2)  In each fiscal year, a county described by Subsection
 (b-1) may retain, from fines collected for violations of this title
 and from special expenses collected under Article 45.051, Code of
 Criminal Procedure, in cases in which a violation of this title is
 alleged, an amount equal to 30 percent of the county's revenue for
 the preceding fiscal year from all sources, other than federal
 funds and bond proceeds, as shown by an audit performed under
 Chapter 115, Local Government Code. After a county has retained
 that amount, the county shall send to the comptroller any portion of
 a fine or a special expense collected that exceeds $1.
 (c)  The comptroller shall enforce Subsections [Subsection]
 (b) and (b-2).
 (d-1)  In a fiscal year in which a county retains from fines
 and special expenses collected for violations of this title an
 amount equal to at least 20 percent of the county's revenue for the
 preceding fiscal year from all sources other than federal funds and
 bond proceeds, not later than the 120th day after the last day of
 the county's fiscal year, the county shall send to the comptroller:
 (1)  a copy of the county's financial statement; and
 (2)  a report that shows the total amount collected for
 that fiscal year from fines and special expenses under Subsection
 (b-1).
 (e)  If an audit is conducted by the comptroller under
 Subsection (c) and it is determined that the municipality or county
 is retaining more than 20 percent of the amounts under Subsection
 (b) or (b-2), as applicable, and has not complied with Subsection
 (d) or (d-1), as applicable, the municipality or county shall pay
 the costs incurred by the comptroller in conducting the audit.
 (f)  A municipality may include the revenue generated from
 services provided in the municipality by a utility company
 operating within the municipality as municipal revenue for a fiscal
 year under Subsection (b) if:
 (1)  the municipality has a population of more than
 1,000 but less than 1,200; and
 (2)  part of the municipality's boundary is a river that
 forms part of the boundary between two counties.
 (g)  This subsection and Subsection (f) expire on September
 1, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act in amending
 Section 542.402(e), Transportation Code, and in adding Sections
 542.402(b-2) and (d-1), Transportation Code, applies only to the
 fiscal year of a county that begins on or after the effective date
 of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1517 was passed by the House on May 5,
 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 142, Nays 4, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 1517 on May 26, 2011, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 1517 on May 29, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 140,
 Nays 3, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1517 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 29, Nays
 1
 ; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 1517 on May 28, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor