E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6918
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5042
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6455
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6459
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5750
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3535
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3535
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3535
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3535
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3535
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3535
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3535
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2710
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2550
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2306
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2306
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2273
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3679
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#994
|
Journal Page: 3679
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3679
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3678
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3590
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1)
|
Journal Page: 3590
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3590
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1545
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 594
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 594
|
House
|
02/18/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|