E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5140
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4084
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5975
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5976
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1554
|
Journal Page: 5975
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5975
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5397
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3459
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3459
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3459
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3458
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3458
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3458
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3458
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Williams
|
Journal Page: 3458
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3457
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3457
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2612
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 1600
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1600
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1296
|
House
|
04/25/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2264
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#503
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2132
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2132
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1642
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 595
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 595
|
House
|
02/18/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|