E
|
05/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4186
|
E
|
05/06/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3202
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2047
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3175
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3202
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2939
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1761
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1761
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1761
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1761
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1761
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1761
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1761
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1375
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1082
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1082
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 843
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1374
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#163
|
Journal Page: 1132
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1132
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1132
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1125
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1125
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 942
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2011
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 700
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 596
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 596
|
House
|
02/21/2011
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|