Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1559 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: S. Davis of Harris, et al. H.B. No. 1559
 (Senate Sponsor - Huffman)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 May 3, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 12, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 12, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the retention, storage, and destruction of certain
 court documents.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 441, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter B to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER B.  COURT DOCUMENTS
 Sec. 441.025.  DEFINITIONS.  In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Commission" means the Texas State Library and
 Archives Commission.
 (2)  "Court document" means any instrument, document,
 paper, or other record filed with, otherwise presented to, or
 produced by a court in this state.
 Sec. 441.026.  RETENTION, STORAGE, AND DESTRUCTION OF
 CERTAIN COURT DOCUMENTS. (a)  The commission shall adopt rules for
 the retention, storage, and destruction of a court document filed
 with, otherwise presented to, or produced by a court in this state
 before January 1, 1951.
 (b)  A court in this state may not destroy a court document
 described by Subsection (a) except as provided by rules of the
 commission.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *