Senate | 05/16/2011 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 2372 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2372 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2317 | |
House | 05/15/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4063 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3864 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3863 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Record vote | RV#1044 | Journal Page: 3864 |
House | 05/13/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3864 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3864 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3834 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3834 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3300 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2011 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 658 | |
House | 03/03/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 658 | |
House | 02/21/2011 | Filed |