Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 3330
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2553
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2368
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 2306
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2306
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2273
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1017
|
Journal Page: 3702
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3702
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3702
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3637
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3637
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3637
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2551
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 659
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 659
|
House
|
02/21/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|