House
|
05/06/2011
|
Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Corrected comm. report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3202
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3177
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Subcommittee meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2011
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 659
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 659
|
House
|
02/21/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|