Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1593 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Isaac (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 1593
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 May 3, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 17, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 17, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the inclusion of a candidate's e-mail address on an
 official application for a place on the ballot.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 141.039, Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 141.039.  OFFICIAL APPLICATION FORM. In addition to
 the other statements and spaces for entering information that
 appear on an officially prescribed form for an application for a
 place on the ballot, each official form for an application that a
 candidate is required to file under this code must include:
 (1)  a space for indicating the form in which the
 candidate's name is to appear on the ballot;
 (2)  a space for the candidate's mailing address;
 (3)  spaces for the candidate's home and office
 telephone numbers and e-mail address; and
 (4)  a statement informing candidates that the
 furnishing of the telephone numbers or e-mail address is optional.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *