E
|
06/17/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5140
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4564
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
House discharges conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4564
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 6301
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6302
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1636
|
Journal Page: 6302
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 6301
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
House discharges conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 6301
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3996
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3996
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3996
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5888
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5888
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5888
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5043
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3094
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3094
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3094
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3094
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Jackson
|
Journal Page: 3093
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3093
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3093
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3093
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 3074
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3074
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3074
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2611
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2143
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2143
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2053
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3202
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2985
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#763
|
Journal Page: 2984
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2984
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Amended
|
5-Otto
|
Journal Page: 2984
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2982
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2901
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2901
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Amended
|
8-Hilderbran
|
Journal Page: 2900
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
4-P. King
|
Journal Page: 2900
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Vote reconsidered
|
4-P. King
|
Journal Page: 2900
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2897
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1642
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 662
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 662
|
House
|
02/22/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|