Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1622 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Menendez (Senate Sponsor - Wentworth) H.B. No. 1622
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2011;
 May 5, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 21, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 21, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to suits to enjoin gang activity that constitutes a public
 nuisance.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 125.061(3), Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (3)  "Gang activity" means the following types of
 conduct:
 (A)  organized criminal activity as described by
 Section 71.02, Penal Code;
 (B)  terroristic threat as described by Section
 22.07, Penal Code;
 (C)  coercing, soliciting, or inducing gang
 membership as described by Section 22.015, Penal Code;
 (D)  criminal trespass as described by Section
 30.05, Penal Code;
 (E)  disorderly conduct as described by Section
 42.01, Penal Code;
 (F)  criminal mischief as described by Section
 28.03, Penal Code, that causes a pecuniary loss of $500 or more;
 (G)  a graffiti offense in violation of Section
 28.08, Penal Code[, that:
 [(i)     causes a pecuniary loss of $500 or
 more; or
 [(ii)     occurs at a school, an institution of
 higher education, a place of worship or human cemetery, a public
 monument, or a community center that provides medical, social, or
 educational programs];
 (H)  a weapons offense in violation of Chapter 46,
 Penal Code; or
 (I)  unlawful possession of a substance or other
 item in violation of Chapter 481, Health and Safety Code.
 SECTION 2.  Section 125.067(c), Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (c)  If an appeal is not taken by a person temporarily
 enjoined under this subchapter, the person is entitled to a trial on
 the merits not later than the 90th day after the date of the
 temporary injunctive order, unless otherwise ordered by the court.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a cause of action that accrues on or after the effective date of
 this Act. A cause of action that accrues before the effective date
 of this Act is governed by the law in effect immediately before the
 effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *