Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1629 Introduced / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    82R6907 ALL-D
 By: Anchia H.B. No. 1629


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to energy efficiency goals and public information
 regarding energy efficiency programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 39.905, Utilities Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (b-5) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  It is the goal of the legislature that:
 (1)  electric utilities will administer energy
 efficiency incentive programs in a market-neutral,
 nondiscriminatory manner but will not offer underlying competitive
 services;
 (2)  all customers, in all customer classes, will have
 a choice of and access to energy efficiency alternatives and other
 choices from the market that allow each customer to reduce energy
 consumption, peak demand, or energy costs;
 (3)  each electric utility will provide, through
 market-based standard offer programs or limited, targeted,
 market-transformation programs, incentives sufficient for retail
 electric providers and competitive energy service providers to
 acquire additional cost-effective energy efficiency for
 residential and commercial customers equivalent to at least
 one-half of one[:
 [(A)  10] percent of the electric utility's peak
 [annual growth in] demand of residential and commercial customers
 by December 31, 2013 [2007;
 [(B)     15 percent of the electric utility's annual
 growth in demand of residential and commercial customers by
 December 31, 2008, provided that the electric utility's program
 expenditures for 2008 funding may not be greater than 75 percent
 above the utility's program budget for 2007 for residential and
 commercial customers, as included in the April 1, 2006, filing; and
 [(C)     20 percent of the electric utility's annual
 growth in demand of residential and commercial customers by
 December 31, 2009, provided that the electric utility's program
 expenditures for 2009 funding may not be greater than 150 percent
 above the utility's program budget for 2007 for residential and
 commercial customers, as included in the April 1, 2006, filing];
 (4)  each electric utility in the ERCOT region shall
 use its best efforts to encourage and facilitate the involvement of
 the region's retail electric providers in the delivery of
 efficiency programs and demand response programs under this
 section, including programs for demand-side renewable energy
 systems that:
 (A)  use distributed renewable generation, as
 defined by Section 39.916; or
 (B)  reduce the need for energy consumption by
 using a renewable energy technology, a geothermal heat pump, a
 solar water heater, or another natural mechanism of the
 environment;
 (5)  retail electric providers in the ERCOT region, and
 electric utilities outside of the ERCOT region, shall provide
 customers with energy efficiency educational materials; and
 (6)  notwithstanding Subsection (a)(3), electric
 utilities shall continue to make available, at 2007 funding and
 participation levels, any load management standard offer programs
 developed for industrial customers and implemented prior to May 1,
 2007.
 (b-5)  The commission shall conduct an annual survey of
 customers that participate in an energy efficiency program in which
 an incentive is offered. The survey must obtain information on
 whether a customer would have installed the energy efficiency
 measure or had the energy efficiency service performed if no
 incentive was offered and whether the customer would have known
 about the energy efficiency program absent efforts made by the
 commission or an electric utility to publicize the program. The
 commission shall submit the results of the survey to the
 legislature in the commission's annual report prescribed by Section
 12.203.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 39, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 39.9054 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.9054.  ENERGY EFFICIENCY PLANS AND REPORTS; PUBLIC
 INFORMATION. (a)  An electric utility shall electronically submit
 an energy efficiency plan and report in a searchable form
 prescribed by the commission on or before April 1 of each year. The
 commission by rule shall adopt a form that will permit the public to
 easily compare information submitted by different electric
 utilities. The plan and report must:
 (1)  provide information on the utility's performance
 in achieving energy efficiency goals for the previous five years;
 (2)  describe how the utility intends to achieve future
 goals; and
 (3)  provide any other information the commission
 considers relevant.
 (b)  On the Internet website found at
 http://www.puc.state.tx.us, the commission shall publish
 information on energy efficiency programs, including:
 (1)  an explanation of the goal for energy efficiency
 in this state;
 (2)  a description of the types of energy efficiency
 programs available to certain classes of eligible customers;
 (3)  a link to the plans and reports filed as prescribed
 by Subsection (a); and
 (4)  a list of persons who install or provide energy
 efficiency measures or services by area.
 (c)  This section does not require the commission to warrant
 that the list required to be displayed under Subsection (b)
 constitutes a complete or accurate list of all persons who install
 energy efficiency measures or services in the marketplace.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.