Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2269
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1600
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1600
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1296
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2171
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2043
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#471
|
Journal Page: 2043
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2043
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
1-Alonzo
|
Journal Page: 2042
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2042
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1934
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#441
|
Journal Page: 1933
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1933
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)
|
Journal Page: 1933
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1933
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Postponed
|
4/19/11 8:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 1863
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1862
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1855
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1463
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 663
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 663
|
House
|
02/22/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|