Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1643 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Zerwas (Senate Sponsor - Hegar) H.B. No. 1643
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2011;
 May 5, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Economic
 Development; May 13, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 13, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the duration of a development agreement governing land
 in the extraterritorial jurisdiction of certain municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 212.172(b) and (d), Local Government
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The governing body of a municipality may make a written
 contract with an owner of land that is located in the
 extraterritorial jurisdiction of the municipality to:
 (1)  guarantee the continuation of the
 extraterritorial status of the land and its immunity from
 annexation by the municipality [for a period not to exceed 15
 years];
 (2)  extend the municipality's planning authority over
 the land by providing for a development plan to be prepared by the
 landowner and approved by the municipality under which certain
 general uses and development of the land are authorized;
 (3)  authorize enforcement by the municipality of
 certain municipal land use and development regulations in the same
 manner the regulations are enforced within the municipality's
 boundaries;
 (4)  authorize enforcement by the municipality of land
 use and development regulations other than those that apply within
 the municipality's boundaries, as may be agreed to by the landowner
 and the municipality;
 (5)  provide for infrastructure for the land,
 including:
 (A)  streets and roads;
 (B)  street and road drainage;
 (C)  land drainage; and
 (D)  water, wastewater, and other utility
 systems;
 (6)  authorize enforcement of environmental
 regulations;
 (7)  provide for the annexation of the land as a whole
 or in parts and to provide for the terms of annexation, if
 annexation is agreed to by the parties;
 (8)  specify the uses and development of the land
 before and after annexation, if annexation is agreed to by the
 parties; or
 (9)  include other lawful terms and considerations the
 parties consider appropriate.
 (d)  [The parties to a contract may renew or extend it for
 successive periods not to exceed 15 years each.] The total duration
 of the [original] contract and any successive renewals or
 extensions may not exceed 45 years.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *