Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2506
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 2143
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2143
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2053
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3202
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2964
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#741
|
Journal Page: 2963
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2963
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Amended
|
1-S. Miller
|
Journal Page: 2963
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2963
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2881
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#716
|
Journal Page: 2881
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2881
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Amended
|
4-S. Miller
|
Journal Page: 2881
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
3-Workman
|
Journal Page: 2879
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Point of order overruled (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 2879
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
3-Workman, Zerwas, Isaac, Sheffield, Hilderbran, Paxton, Callegari, Aliseda, Schwertner, Hardcastle,
|
Journal Page: 2879
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2878
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2146
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 2146
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2132
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2132
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Amended
|
2-Marquez
|
Journal Page: 2132
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2132
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1599
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 664
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 664
|
House
|
02/22/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|