|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
|
05/30/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5084
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 5084
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 5084
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5084
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 5084
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 5083
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 5083
|
|
05/29/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Returned from the House for further action
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Returned to the Senate for further action
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4615
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2660
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2660
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2660
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2660
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Hinojosa
|
Journal Page: 2657
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
Journal Page: 2657
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5084
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Motion fails
|
|
Journal Page: 2656
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Motion to reconsider
|
|
Journal Page: 2656
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2656
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/20/11
|
Journal Page: 2607
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2607
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 2607
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2549
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2549
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2549
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2549
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2549
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2549
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Fraser
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2269
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal
|
|
Journal Page: 1705
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1705
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1365
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#511
|
Journal Page: 2193
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2193
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2193
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2177
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2182
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2182
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1866
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
Journal Page: 665
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 665
|
House
|
02/22/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|