E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6918
|
E
|
05/20/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4766
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2609
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4181
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4338
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2384
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4002
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1114
|
Journal Page: 4002
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4002
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2911
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1724
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1724
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1724
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1724
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1724
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1724
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1723
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 West
|
Journal Page: 1723
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1723
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1723
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1428
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 994
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 994
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 843
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1228
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#163
|
Journal Page: 1132
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1132
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1132
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1125
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1125
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1089
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 666
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 666
|
House
|
02/23/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|