05/13/2011 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |||
05/13/2011 | Received from the House | |||
05/13/2011 | Read first time | |||
05/12/2011 | Reported engrossed | |||
05/12/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |||
05/12/2011 | Record vote | |||
05/12/2011 | Passed | |||
05/12/2011 | Read 3rd time | |||
05/11/2011 | Passed to engrossment | |||
05/11/2011 | Read 2nd time | |||
05/07/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | |||
05/05/2011 | Considered in Calendars | |||
04/20/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |||
04/19/2011 | Committee report distributed | |||
04/19/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |||
04/18/2011 | Vote reconsidered in committee | |||
04/18/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | |||
04/18/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |||
04/13/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |||
04/13/2011 | Considered in public hearing | |||
04/13/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |||
03/14/2011 | Referred to Public Health | |||
02/23/2011 | Filed |