Senate | 05/19/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2583 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4618 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Record vote | RV#1160 | Journal Page: 4215 |
House | 05/19/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 4215 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4215 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 4212 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 4210 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4210 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2391 | |
House | 04/20/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2011 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 667 | |
House | 03/03/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 667 | |
House | 02/23/2011 | Filed |