House | 03/31/2011 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 1374 | |
House | 03/16/2011 | Withdrawn from schedule | ||
House | 03/16/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2011 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 669 | |
House | 03/03/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 669 | |
House | 02/24/2011 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 02/23/2011 | Filed |