E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6918
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5140
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6458
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4577
|
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4577
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6416
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4471
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5963
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5963
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3995
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3995
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3338
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3338
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3338
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4966
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4966
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4966
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4614
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2650
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2650
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2650
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2650
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2650
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2650
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2650
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Jackson
|
Journal Page: 2650
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2649
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2649
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2309
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2193
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Referred to Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1631
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1631
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1365
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2209
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#527
|
Journal Page: 2209
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2209
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2208
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2162
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2162
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Amended
|
1-J. Davis
|
Journal Page: 2162
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2162
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1768
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Withdrawn from schedule
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Withdrawn from schedule
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1106
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
|
|
Journal Page: 669
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 669
|
House
|
02/23/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|