E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6918
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5140
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4085
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5986
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5987
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1558
|
Journal Page: 5986
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5986
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5382
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3148
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3148
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3148
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3148
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3148
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3148
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3148
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 Nelson
|
Journal Page: 3132
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3132
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3132
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2552
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2507
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2143
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2143
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1766
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3178
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2827
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#678
|
Journal Page: 2826
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2826
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Coleman
|
Journal Page: 2826
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2826
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2747
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Amended
|
1-J. Davis
|
Journal Page: 2744
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2744
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2006
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 845
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 845
|
House
|
02/23/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|