Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1721 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Lucio III, Hartnett H.B. No. 1721
 (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 May 3, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 21, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 21, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to protective orders for certain victims of stalking or
 sexual assault.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 6, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 6.09 to read as follows:
 Art. 6.09.  STALKING PROTECTIVE ORDER.  (a) At any
 proceeding related to an offense under Section 42.072, Penal Code,
 in which the defendant appears before the court, a person may
 request the court to render a protective order under Title 4, Family
 Code, for the protection of the person.  The request is made by
 filing "An Application for a Protective Order" in the same manner as
 an application for a protective order under Title 4, Family Code.
 (b)  The court shall render a protective order in the manner
 provided by Title 4, Family Code, if, in lieu of the finding that
 family violence occurred and is likely to occur in the future as
 required by Section 85.001, Family Code, the court finds that
 probable cause exists to believe that an offense under Section
 42.072, Penal Code, occurred and that the nature of the scheme or
 course of conduct engaged in by the defendant in the commission of
 the offense indicates that the defendant is likely to engage in the
 future in conduct prohibited by Section 42.072(a)(1), (2), or (3),
 Penal Code.
 (c)  The procedure for the enforcement of a protective order
 under Title 4, Family Code, applies to the fullest extent
 practicable to the enforcement of a protective order under this
 article, including provisions relating to findings, contents,
 duration, warning, delivery, law enforcement duties, and
 modification.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 7A, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 7A.035 to read as follows:
 Art. 7A.035.  HEARSAY STATEMENT OF CHILD VICTIM. In a
 hearing on an application for a protective order under this
 chapter, a statement that is made by a child younger than 14 years
 of age who is the victim of an offense under Section 21.02, 21.11,
 22.011, or 22.021, Penal Code, and that describes the offense
 committed against the child is admissible as evidence in the same
 manner that a child's statement regarding alleged abuse against the
 child is admissible under Section 104.006, Family Code, in a suit
 affecting the parent-child relationship.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  Article 6.09, Code of Criminal Procedure,
 as added by this Act, applies to the commission of an offense under
 Section 42.072, Penal Code, without regard to whether the offense
 was committed before, on, or after the effective date of this Act.
 (b)  Article 7A.035, Code of Criminal Procedure, as added by
 this Act, applies only to a hearing on an application for a
 protective order that is commenced on or after the effective date of
 this Act.  A hearing on an application for a protective order that
 is commenced before the effective date of this Act is governed by
 the law in effect on the date the hearing was commenced, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *