House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2323 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/10/2011 | Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform | Journal Page: 771 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 771 | |
House | 03/03/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 670 | |
House | 03/03/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 670 | |
House | 02/23/2011 | Filed |