Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1737 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Bohac (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 1737
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 May 3, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 19, 2011, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2011,
 sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the installation of a speed feedback sign by a property
 owners' association.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 430, Transportation Code, is amended by
 adding Section 430.002 to read as follows:
 Sec. 430.002.  SPEED FEEDBACK SIGNS ERECTED BY NEIGHBORHOOD
 ASSOCIATION. (a) In this section, "property owners' association"
 means an association described by Section 204.004, Property Code.
 (b)  A property owners' association may install a speed
 feedback sign on a road, highway, or street in the association's
 jurisdiction if:
 (1)  the association receives the consent of the
 governing body of the political subdivision that maintains the
 road, highway, or street for the placement of the sign; and
 (2)  the association pays for the installation of the
 sign.
 (c)  A property owners' association that installs a speed
 feedback sign under this section is responsible for the maintenance
 of the sign.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *