Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2372
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2372
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2236
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3560
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#966
|
Journal Page: 3559
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3559
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Crownover
|
Journal Page: 3559
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Postponed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3552
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3408
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3408
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Anchia
|
Journal Page: 3408
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3408
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1835
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
|
|
Journal Page: 673
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 673
|
House
|
02/24/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|