Senate | 05/03/2011 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 1705 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1705 | |
Senate | 04/27/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1365 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2391 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2193 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Record vote | RV#511 | Journal Page: 2193 |
House | 04/26/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2193 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2193 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2177 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2182 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2182 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/01/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/01/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1463 | |
House | 03/29/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2011 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 673 | |
House | 03/03/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 673 | |
House | 02/24/2011 | Filed |