E
|
06/17/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5117
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6869
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3798
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5786
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5787
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1519
|
Journal Page: 5786
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5786
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5391
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3348
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3348
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3348
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3348
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3348
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3348
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3348
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2976
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1339
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1339
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1141
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1909
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1800
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1798
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#375
|
Journal Page: 1800
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1800
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1800
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1786
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1786
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1463
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 673
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 673
|
House
|
02/24/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|