1 | 1 | | By: Madden (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 1770 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2011; |
---|
3 | 3 | | April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | 4 | | Criminal Justice; May 9, 2011, reported favorably by the following |
---|
5 | 5 | | vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 9, 2011, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to the payment of temporary housing costs for certain |
---|
11 | 11 | | inmates released or eligible for release on parole or to mandatory |
---|
12 | 12 | | supervision. |
---|
13 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Section 508.157, Government Code, is amended by |
---|
15 | 15 | | adding Subsections (a-1) and (e-1) and amending Subsections (b), |
---|
16 | 16 | | (c), (e), (f), and (g) to read as follows: |
---|
17 | 17 | | (a-1) In this section, "residential correctional facility" |
---|
18 | 18 | | means a facility operated by or under contract with the department |
---|
19 | 19 | | to provide housing, supervision, and programmatic support to |
---|
20 | 20 | | individuals released on parole or to mandatory supervision. The |
---|
21 | 21 | | term includes a halfway house described by Section 508.118 or a |
---|
22 | 22 | | community residential facility described by Section 508.119. The |
---|
23 | 23 | | term does not include a transitional treatment center, a substance |
---|
24 | 24 | | abuse felony punishment facility, or any other facility operated by |
---|
25 | 25 | | or under contract with the department the primary purpose of which |
---|
26 | 26 | | is to provide substance abuse treatment or aftercare. |
---|
27 | 27 | | (b) If the department does not operate or contract for the |
---|
28 | 28 | | operation of a residential correctional facility in the county of |
---|
29 | 29 | | legal residence of an inmate or releasee, the [The] department may |
---|
30 | 30 | | issue, [payment for the cost of temporary post-release housing] for |
---|
31 | 31 | | an inmate described by Subsection (a) or for a releasee, payment for |
---|
32 | 32 | | the cost of temporary post-release housing that: |
---|
33 | 33 | | (1) meets any conditions or requirements imposed by a |
---|
34 | 34 | | parole panel; |
---|
35 | 35 | | (2) [and] is located in the county of legal residence |
---|
36 | 36 | | of the inmate or releasee; and |
---|
37 | 37 | | (3) except as provided by Subsection (e-1), is in a |
---|
38 | 38 | | structure that existed on June 1, 2009, as a multifamily residence |
---|
39 | 39 | | or as a motel to which Section 156.001, Tax Code, applies. |
---|
40 | 40 | | (c) The amount of payment issued under Subsection (b) may |
---|
41 | 41 | | not exceed an amount that is equal to the cost the department would |
---|
42 | 42 | | incur, for the period for which the payment is issued, to: |
---|
43 | 43 | | (1) incarcerate the inmate or releasee in a facility |
---|
44 | 44 | | operated by or under contract with the department; or |
---|
45 | 45 | | (2) house the inmate or releasee in a residential |
---|
46 | 46 | | correctional facility [for the period for which the payment is |
---|
47 | 47 | | issued]. |
---|
48 | 48 | | (e) The executive director of the Texas Department of |
---|
49 | 49 | | Criminal Justice shall adopt rules as necessary to implement this |
---|
50 | 50 | | section[, including rules that ensure that the food, hygiene, and |
---|
51 | 51 | | clothing needs of an inmate or releasee on whose behalf payment is |
---|
52 | 52 | | issued under this section are adequately met during the period for |
---|
53 | 53 | | which the payment is issued]. |
---|
54 | 54 | | (e-1) The department may issue payment for post-release |
---|
55 | 55 | | housing under Subsection (b) for a structure not described by |
---|
56 | 56 | | Subsection (b)(3) if, before issuing payment, the department or the |
---|
57 | 57 | | owner of the structure provides, in the same manner as required for |
---|
58 | 58 | | a community corrections facility under Section 509.010, notice of |
---|
59 | 59 | | the proposed use of the structure under this section and a hearing |
---|
60 | 60 | | on the issue of whether the use is appropriate. |
---|
61 | 61 | | (f) Not later than September 30 of each year, [2010, for the |
---|
62 | 62 | | first report and September 30, 2011, for the second report,] the |
---|
63 | 63 | | department shall submit to the presiding officer of each |
---|
64 | 64 | | legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction over the |
---|
65 | 65 | | department [Criminal Justice Legislative Oversight Committee] a |
---|
66 | 66 | | report that covers the period of August 1 of the year preceding the |
---|
67 | 67 | | year in which the report is submitted through September 1 of the |
---|
68 | 68 | | year in which the report is submitted and that includes: |
---|
69 | 69 | | (1) the total number of inmates and releasees on whose |
---|
70 | 70 | | behalf payment is issued under this section; |
---|
71 | 71 | | (2) the total dollar amount of payments issued under |
---|
72 | 72 | | this section; and |
---|
73 | 73 | | (3) the county of release and the county of legal |
---|
74 | 74 | | residence of each inmate or releasee on whose behalf payment is |
---|
75 | 75 | | issued under this section. |
---|
76 | 76 | | (g) This subsection and Subsection (f) expire January 1, |
---|
77 | 77 | | 2014 [2012]. |
---|
78 | 78 | | SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only |
---|
79 | 79 | | to an inmate who is eligible for release on parole or to mandatory |
---|
80 | 80 | | supervision on or after September 1, 2011, or who is released on |
---|
81 | 81 | | parole or to mandatory supervision on or after that date. |
---|
82 | 82 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
83 | 83 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
84 | 84 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
85 | 85 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
86 | 86 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2011. |
---|
87 | 87 | | * * * * * |
---|