05/19/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | |||
05/19/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |||
05/18/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | |||
05/18/2011 | Considered in public hearing | |||
05/18/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |||
05/13/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | |||
05/13/2011 | Received from the House | |||
05/13/2011 | Read first time | |||
05/12/2011 | Reported engrossed | |||
05/12/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |||
05/12/2011 | Record vote | |||
05/12/2011 | Passed | |||
05/12/2011 | Read 3rd time | |||
05/11/2011 | Passed to engrossment | |||
05/11/2011 | Read 2nd time | |||
05/06/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | |||
05/04/2011 | Considered in Calendars | |||
05/04/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |||
05/03/2011 | Committee report distributed | |||
05/03/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |||
04/21/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | |||
04/21/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | |||
04/21/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |||
04/05/2011 | Left pending in committee | |||
04/05/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Insurance | |||
02/24/2011 | Filed |