House | 05/02/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/01/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1463 | |
House | 03/30/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2011 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 674 | |
House | 03/03/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 674 | |
House | 02/24/2011 | Filed |