E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5140
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3996
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5885
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5886
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1538
|
Journal Page: 5885
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5885
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5391
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3372
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3372
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3372
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3372
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3372
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3372
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3371
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Uresti
|
Journal Page: 3371
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3371
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3371
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 3319
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2708
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Referred to International Relations and Trade
|
|
Journal Page: 2707
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Rereferred to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2707
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2188
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2188
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2071
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3300
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#815
|
Journal Page: 3126
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3126
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Amended
|
2-Gallego
|
Journal Page: 3126
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3126
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/6/11 1:16 PM
|
Journal Page: 3120
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3120
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3076
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3076
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Larson
|
Journal Page: 3076
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 3076
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3075
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3075
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 675
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 675
|
House
|
02/24/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|