Senate | 05/17/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2368 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1278 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1278 | |
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1011 | |
House | 04/08/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1663 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Record vote | RV#294 | Journal Page: 1583 |
House | 04/07/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1583 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1583 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1566 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1566 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/25/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/25/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1099 | |
House | 03/15/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/15/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/15/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/15/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/15/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2011 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 676 | |
House | 03/03/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 676 | |
House | 02/24/2011 | Filed |