E | 05/21/2011 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/21/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5048 | |
E | 05/11/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3830 | |
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2214 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3538 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3652 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3298 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2077 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2077 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2077 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2077 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2077 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2077 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2076 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1708 | |
Senate | 05/02/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/02/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 1339 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1339 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1168 | |
House | 04/18/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2006 | |
House | 04/18/2011 | Record vote | RV#410 | Journal Page: 1874 |
House | 04/18/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1874 | |
House | 04/18/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1874 | |
House | 04/15/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1855 | |
House | 04/15/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1855 | |
House | 04/15/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1855 | |
House | 04/15/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/01/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1463 | |
House | 03/28/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/16/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/16/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/16/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/16/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2011 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 676 | |
House | 03/03/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 676 | |
House | 02/24/2011 | Filed |