House | 05/04/2011 | Postponed | 7/4/12 12:00 PM | Journal Page: 2908 |
House | 05/04/2011 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 2908 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2885 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Record vote | RV#717 | Journal Page: 2884 |
House | 05/04/2011 | Failed to pass to engrossment | Journal Page: 2884 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2884 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2005 | |
House | 04/13/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/10/2011 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 748 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 748 | |
House | 02/24/2011 | Filed |