E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6918
|
E
|
05/26/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6284
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3772
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5417
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5763
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3338
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4967
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1328
|
Journal Page: 4967
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4967
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4615
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2694
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2694
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2694
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2694
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2694
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2694
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2694
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Seliger
|
Journal Page: 2693
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2693
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2693
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2553
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2198
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3830
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#894
|
Journal Page: 3323
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3323
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3323
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3245
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3245
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Amended
|
4-Christian
|
Journal Page: 3245
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
1-Y. Davis
|
Journal Page: 3244
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
2-Y. Davis
|
Journal Page: 3243
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Y. Davis
|
Journal Page: 3243
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3243
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3178
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Returned to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3074
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Point of order sustained
|
Rule 4, Section 18(c)
|
Journal Page: 3074
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3073
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2796
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 748
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 748
|
House
|
02/24/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|