Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1839 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Phillips (Senate Sponsor - Jackson) H.B. No. 1839
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2011;
 May 9, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Economic
 Development; May 20, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 1; May 20, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to excluding a provider of recreational classes that do
 not lead to an educational credential from regulation as a career
 school or college.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 132, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 132.005 to read as follows:
 Sec. 132.005.  APPLICABILITY.  This chapter does not apply
 to a school or training program that offers only avocational or
 recreational instruction or teacher instruction for the following
 subjects:
 (1)  dance;
 (2)  music;
 (3)  martial arts;
 (4)  yoga;
 (5)  physical fitness;
 (6)  horseback riding;
 (7)  riflery or other weapon use;
 (8)  sewing, knitting, or other needlecrafts; or
 (9)  sports.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *